Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain zoning approval is not required to use a facility for satellite simulcast betting if the facility is zoned for operation of a video lottery facility, a sports wagering facility, or electronic bingo or tip jar machines; altering certain provisions of law governing the awarding of certain sports wagering facility licenses to facilities located within a certain distance of certain other sports wagering facilities; repealing certain requirements related to the amenities of satellite simulcast facilities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0792
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {793829/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Buckel and Patterson)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Buckel and Patterson)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, King and Salling)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, King and Salling)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report {653529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-1)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report {653529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders - Alterations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-3) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {793829/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Buckel and Patterson) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Buckel and Patterson) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, King and Salling) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, King and Salling) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Conference Committee Report {653529/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (116-1) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Conference Committee Report {653529/1 Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text - Chapter - Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page