Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Incentives
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an affiliate of a vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch to offer certain incentives to all dealers of the same line make under certain circumstances; requiring a vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch or affiliate to offer certain incentives to all purchasers of vehicles of the same line make under certain circumstances; requiring that any system operated by a vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch or affiliate for allocating new vehicles to dealers be reasonable and fair; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0886
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Incentives
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Incentives
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page