Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Planning to provide a list of excess real property owned by the State to the Department of Housing and Community Development; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to determine whether any of the listed properties are suitable for use or redevelopment as affordable housing; altering the contents of the Rental Housing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $30,000,000 of income tax revenue from individuals to the Rental Housing Fund on or before June 30, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0744
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433122/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-4)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Listing and Disposal of Excess Real Property
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433122/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Listing and Disposal of Excess Real Property
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {763829/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (122-4) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text - Chapter - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
(   2-605.2 )
Last Updated: 7/27/2022 11:45 AM
Click to return on the top page