Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Local Requests for Guidance – Religious Considerations
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor, on request of a local jurisdiction and in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to provide guidance for the implementation and enforcement of the Maryland Building Performance Standards in relation to any religious observance, practice, or belief.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1033
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Building Performance Standards – Local Requests for Guidance – Religious Considerations
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Building Performance Standards – Local Requests for Guidance – Religious Considerations
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (140-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2024 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page