Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public Schools - Asian American History Curriculum Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama and Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content standards for a unit of instruction on Asian American history in public schools in the State; requiring each county board of education to implement the Asian American history curriculum content standards, beginning in the 2023-2024 school year; and requiring each board to ensure that a units of instruction on Asian American history is taught at least once during elementary school, middle school, and once in a history course required to graduate from high school; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0304
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Public Schools - Asian American History Curriculum Requirement
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Age
(   7-205.5 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page