Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Life Imprisonment
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual serving a term of life imprisonment for first-degree murder committed on or after October 1, 2022, from being eligible for medical parole; and repealing provisions relating to gubernatorial approval of a decision of the Maryland Parole Commission to grant medical parole to an inmate serving a sentence of life imprisonment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0774
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {403526/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (43-77)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {423727/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted (93-25)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (82-54)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Life Imprisonment
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Floor Amendment {403526/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (43-77) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Floor Amendment {423727/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted (93-25) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Life Imprisonment
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (82-54) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page