Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - County Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsored by
Delegate Fair
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to set special property tax rates for certain subclasses of property for the purpose of financing certain transportation improvements or a certain minimum school funding amount; prohibiting a special rate from exceeding 12.5 cents for each $100 of assessed value; and establishing certain subclasses of real property.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - County Authority to Set Special Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - County Authority to Set Special Rates
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:13 PM
Click to return on the top page