Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Landlord and Tenant - Tenant Access to Cable Television Systems and Equipment MC 01-22
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for the installation and removal of cable television systems within the individual dwelling units of leased residential property in Montgomery County; authorizing a tenant, landlord, or cable television company to bring an action in a court of competent jurisdiction and a county to adopt local laws, ordinances, or regulations to enforce the provisions of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-39)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Montgomery County - Landlord and Tenant - Tenant Access to Cable Television Systems and Equipment MC 01-22
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {493125/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Landlord and Tenant - Tenant Access to Cable Television Systems and Equipment MC 01-22
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-39) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page