Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Hinebaugh
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "hotel" for purposes of the hotel rental tax in Garrett County to include a transient vacation rental unit and exclude certain facilities; altering the definition of "transient charge" for purposes of the county hotel rental tax; defining "short term rental platform" as a service provided on the Internet that advertises hotels and receives certain compensation; requiring certain short-term rental platforms and managers to perform certain duties related to the collection and remittance of the hotel rental tax: etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0787
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-6)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Alterations
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Alterations
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (123-6) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:13 PM
Click to return on the top page