Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Suppliers of Water - Notification Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering certain notice requirements that a supplier of water must give to the Department of the Environment and certain individuals and entities under certain circumstances; requiring a supplier of water to give notice to the Department of the Environment and the Maryland Department of Emergency Management if there is a positive test for E. coli in the system and immediately begin certain preparations; requiring each community water system to ensure that certain testing is performed on water provided by the system; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Suppliers of Water - Notification Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Suppliers of Water - Notification Requirements
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:13 PM
Click to return on the top page