Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State-Related Institutions - Required Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring certain State-related institutions to submit annually a certain financial disclosure report and a certain supplemental report for public institutions of postsecondary education to certain entities under certain circumstances; requiring a State-related institution to submit a certain annual list of certain contracts executed by the State-related institution to the Governor and General Assembly; requiring State-related institutions to make copies of certain meeting minutes and certain reports available for public inspection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State-Related Institutions - Required Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State-Related Institutions - Required Reports
House 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-06 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page