Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Retail Sales of Gift Cards (Gift Card Scams Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from selling a certain open- or closed-loop gift card to a consumer unless the merchant meets certain requirements; requiring a merchant to provide to the employees of the merchant training on identification of gift card fraud; requiring the Division of Consumer Protection to create a certain notice and issue certain guidelines regarding gift card fraud; requiring a certain third-party gift card reseller to record and maintain a copy of certain information for at least 3 years: etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0760
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2025, October 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {283621/1 (Delegate Buckel) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Harrison and Howard)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Harrison and Howard)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kramer, Hayes and Mautz)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kramer, Hayes and Mautz)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Retail Sales of Gift Cards (Gift Card Scams Prevention Act of 2024)
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {563828/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Floor Amendment {283621/1 (Delegate Buckel) Withdrawn 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Retail Sales of Gift Cards (Gift Card Scams Prevention Act of 2024)
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {713820/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Harrison and Howard) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Harrison and Howard) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kramer, Hayes and Mautz) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kramer, Hayes and Mautz) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-301,   14-4601 through 14-4606 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 1:57 PM
Click to return on the top page