Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the process by which a defective corporate act may be ratified; and altering rules for certain legal actions by persons claiming to be adversely affected by a ratification.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page