Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Howard County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Returned Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page