Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Regulating the use of genetic data by direct-to-consumer genetic testing companies, including by requiring a direct-to-consumer genetic testing company to provide consumers with clear and complete information regarding the company's policies and procedures, obtain certain consents from consumers before collecting, using, or disclosing the consumer's genetic data, and develop and implement policies and procedures to protect genetic data and provide certain disclosures to law enforcement or other government agencies; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0766
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-25)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483322/1
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Sydnor) Adopted (24-20)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) Rejected (18-25)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Feldman) Rejected (31-12)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Hershey) Adopted (39-7)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (38-9)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-26)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783629/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (104-25) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483322/1 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Sydnor) Adopted (24-20) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483322/1 Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) Rejected (18-25) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Feldman) Rejected (31-12) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Hershey) Adopted (39-7) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (38-9) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (106-26) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Text - Chapter - Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
(   13-301,   14-4401 through 14-4408 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page