Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Technology Upgrade Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Alston
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to study options for upgrading the licensing and telephone systems used by the State Board of Nursing and submit to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee an action plan on or before October 1, 2024, regarding the acquisition of a new electronic licensing system and telephone system and the staffing of the telephone system, and a report on or before March 1, 2025, on the status of the acquisition of the new systems.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Technology Upgrade Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Technology Upgrade Study
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:11 PM
Click to return on the top page