Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Action Boards
Sponsored by
Delegates Allen and Boafo
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain community action boards to meet certain federal requirements for tripartite boards; and repealing certain requirements relating to the composition of community action boards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Community Action Boards
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Community Action Boards
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Community Action Boards
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Community Action Boards
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2024 3/22/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/6/2024 11:05 AM
Click to return on the top page