Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Charles, Atterbeary, Feldmark, Ivey, Palakovich Carr, and Patterson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting county boards of education and certain schools and prekindergarten programs from taking certain discriminatory actions because of a person's race, ethnicity, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; requiring each county board and certain schools and prekindergarten programs to print a certain statement in their student handbook; providing for the filing of a complaint under the Act with the State Superintendent of Schools; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0666
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0155 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {553226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (37-95)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-36)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-36)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783226/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Floor Amendment {553226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (37-95) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-36) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713224/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-36) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text - Chapter - Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Age
(   2-303,   26-701 through 26-705, 4-108   )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page