Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering procedures that a law enforcement officer and a court are required to follow when the law enforcement officer or court has reason to believe that a child who has been detained is a victim of sex trafficking or human trafficking; providing that a minor may not be criminally prosecuted or proceeded against under certain provisions of law for a certain offense if the minor committed the offense as a direct result of sex trafficking or being a victim of human trafficking; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0768
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-5)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Cassilly)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Cassilly)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Shetty and Munoz)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Shetty and Munoz)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report {433423/1
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {413029/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-5) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {143423/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Cassilly) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Carter and Cassilly) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Shetty and Munoz) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Shetty and Munoz) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Conference Committee Report {433423/1 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page