Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Self-Service Storage Act - Sale of Personal Property in Satisfaction of Liens - Means of Advertising
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Johnson
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an operator or a manager of a self-service storage facility to advertise via e-mail, website, or newspaper of general circulation the sale of the personal property in a self-service storage unit to satisfy a certain lien, without the occupant's prior written authorization in the storage agreement; and altering a certain statement that must be contained in a self-service storage facility rental agreement.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Self-Service Storage Act - Sale of Personal Property in Satisfaction of Liens - Means of Advertising
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {843529/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Self-Service Storage Act - Sale of Personal Property in Satisfaction of Liens - Means of Advertising
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Finance
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:46 AM
Click to return on the top page