Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Landis, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program in the Maryland Department of Labor for the purpose of providing grants to eligible employers for training programs attended by health care workers; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $1,000,000 for the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0518
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243728/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243728/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-1501 through 11-1507 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page