Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Haynes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency to report, beginning October 1, 2021, and every 2 years thereafter, to the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services on certain policies and procedures related to use of force de-escalation training for its law enforcement officers; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to analyze the data collected and report to certain committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2022, and every 2 years thereafter; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page