Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen and Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a regulated person from performing acts that are anticompetitive, unfair, deceptive, abusive, or injurious to the public interest; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to issue orders requiring the correction of a violation of law subject to the jurisdiction of the Commissioner, including the restitution of money or property; and providing for certain information sharing by the Commissioner involving entities engaging in activity over which the Commissioner has jurisdiction.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-34)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-34) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text - Chapter - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page