Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Video and Audio Streaming and Archiving Meetings and Financial Assistance MC/PG 100–21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to stream live video or teleconference audio or other audio of the open meetings of the Commission; requiring the Commission to maintain on its website a complete and unedited archived recording of certain livestreamed open meetings; providing that the inability of the Commission to comply with certain requirements due to a certain technical issue does not affect the validity of actions taken by the Commission at a certain meeting under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Video and Audio Streaming and Archiving Meetings and Financial Assistance MC/PG 100–21
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Video and Audio Streaming and Archiving Meetings and Financial Assistance MC/PG 100–21
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/23/2021 11:19 AM
Click to return on the top page