Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Records and Reporting of Overdoses - Limitations on Use in Criminal Investigation or Prosecution
Sponsored by
Delegates Bridges and Wells
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain overdose information reported by an emergency medical services provider or the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems from being obtained by a law enforcement officer as part of a criminal investigation or prosecution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0568
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Records and Reporting of Overdoses - Limitations on Use in Criminal Investigation or Prosecution
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Records and Reporting of Overdoses - Limitations on Use in Criminal Investigation or Prosecution
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page