Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to update, improve, and develop certain screening tools, submit certain screening tools to the Maryland Department of Health, study certain actions and best practices, develop a certain template, and make and develop certain recommendations; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:00 PM
Click to return on the top page