Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Consultation Project - Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to perform a thorough study, analysis, and evaluation of the Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Consultation Project; requiring that the Department evaluate Project services, capacity, and integration with existing programs; requiring that the Department report on progress toward completing certain recommendations; and requiring the Department to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {475269/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Department of Education - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Consultation Project - Study and Report
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {475269/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Consultation Project - Study and Report
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Returned Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page