Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
Sponsored by
Delegates Munoz, Adams, Anderton, Arikan, Bartlett, Boteler, Buckel, Chang, Chisholm, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, D. Jones, Kipke, Krebs, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Morgan, Novotny, Rogers, Rose, Saab, Szeliga, and Thiam
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding a requirement to the Emergency Medical System plan for guidelines that authorize emergency medical services personnel to provide emergency medical services to canines injured in the line of duty that is owned by, or whose services are employed by certain law enforcement agencies; prohibiting emergency medical services personnel from providing services to a canine if the personnel are needed concurrently to provide services to individuals; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0070
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page