Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Ruth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain testing, certification, and enforcement requirements for certain efficiency standards; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to review certain efficiency standards on or before January 1, 2023; prohibiting the sale, offering for sale, and installation of certain products in the State under certain circumstances beginning on a certain date; requiring the Administration to adopt regulations on efficiency standards for certain products on or before January 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0494
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0418 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {383423/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-93)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {463627/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Adams) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Floor Amendment {383423/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-93) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-39) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Text - Chapter - Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page