Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Special Death Benefit
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Jones
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a line-of-duty special death benefit for members of the Judges' Retirement System; providing for health benefits for a surviving child or dependent parent who is receiving a special death benefit for the death of a member of the Judges' Retirement System; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act to any member of the Judges' Retirement System who is killed prior to the effective date of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0604
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Judges' Retirement System - Special Death Benefit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Judges' Retirement System - Special Death Benefit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Judges' Retirement System - Special Death Benefit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Judges' Retirement System - Special Death Benefit
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Judges' Retirement System - Special Death Benefit
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {583127/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Judges' Retirement System - Special Death Benefit
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:48 AM
Click to return on the top page