Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, except under certain circumstances, a register of wills is not required to record or provide certain documents until certain fees for the administration of an estate have been paid; altering certain probate fees on estates that are valued at a certain amount; requiring a register of wills to collect and assess certain fees at a certain time; authorizing registers of wills to provide certain services and charge certain fees for those services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Reassigned to Judiciary 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
(   2-206, 5-606 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:00 PM
Click to return on the top page