Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Program - Established and Mandated Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Kittleman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Program to provide scholarships for students who are eligible for the free and reduced price lunch program to attend a nonpublic school; requiring the State Department of Education to administer the Program and adopt regulations to implement the Program; and requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2022, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $15,000,000 for the Program.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Education - Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Program - Established and Mandated Funding
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   7-126 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page