Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain petitioner for a recount is not liable for the costs of the recount; providing that certain provisions of the Act apply only to persons that accept public campaign financing under certain provisions of law; providing that a person may accept a donation or make a disbursement related to a contested election only under certain circumstances; requiring that certain unspent public contributions be repaid to a certain government entity; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Contested Elections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {185665/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Contested Elections
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {185665/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Postelection Procedures
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:34 AM
Click to return on the top page