Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Board Membership and Certified Social Worker Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Bhandari
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the State Board of Social Work Examiners; and repealing obsolete references to certified social worker licenses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0106
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Board Membership and Certified Social Worker Licenses
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Board Membership and Certified Social Worker Licenses
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page