Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Application and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Young
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an application for investment by the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to include an option for an applicant to provide certain demographic information of the applicant and the geographic area of the applicant's primary place of business; requiring the Corporation to submit a certain report to the Governor, the Maryland Economic Development Commission, and the General Assembly by October 1 each year concerning certain applicant and investment activities and certain demographic and geographic information; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0358
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-7)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Application and Reporting Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Application and Reporting Requirements
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (125-7) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page