Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Products That Contain Mercury - Fluorescent Lamps - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2025, a person from knowingly selling or distributing as a new manufactured product a screw- or bayonet-base type compact fluorescent lamp in the State; and prohibiting, on or after July 1, 2026, a person from knowingly selling or distributing as a new manufactured product a pin-base type compact fluorescent lamp or a linear fluorescent lamp in the State.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1021 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Products That Contain Mercury - Fluorescent Lamps - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Products That Contain Mercury - Fluorescent Lamps - Prohibition
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:07 PM
Click to return on the top page