Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning on January 1, 2023, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide gender-affirming treatment; and prohibiting the Program from issuing an adverse benefit determination related to gender-affirming treatment unless a health care provider with experience prescribing or delivering gender-affirming treatment has reviewed and confirmed the appropriateness of the determination.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page