Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the procedures for certain State Retirement and Pension System trustee elections; clarifying the survivor benefit for certain beneficiaries of certain retirees of the State Police Retirement System; exempting certain individuals who are retirees of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System from a certain earnings offset under certain circumstances; providing for immediate vesting for certain individuals appointed by the Governor who are serving in certain positions on or after a certain date; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0502
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {173528/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {813224/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page