Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Entering the Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact; requiring that a state meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; establishing duties of member states; authorizing a certain state to charge a certain fee for granting a certain privilege; requiring certain professional counselors to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive certain licensure and exercise a certain privilege; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {996286/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {996286/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text - Chapter - Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:32 PM
Click to return on the top page