Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program – Qualifying Donations
Sponsored by
Delegate Buckel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum threshold for a qualified donation or pledge made to a research endowment of a nonprofit institution of higher education for purposes of the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program if the nonprofit institution of higher education has an annual unrestricted current funds budget of less than $250,000,000.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0473
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development – Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program – Qualifying Donations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program – Qualifying Donations
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text - Chapter - Economic Development – Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program – Qualifying Donations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page