Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "purchaser" for the purpose of certain provisions of State insurance law governing pharmacy benefits managers to exclude certain nonprofit health maintenance organizations; and repealing certain provisions that restrict applicability of certain provisions of law to pharmacy benefits managers that provide pharmacy benefits management services on behalf of a carrier.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0626
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0898 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {783820/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definition of Purchaser and Alteration of Application of Law
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:07 PM
Click to return on the top page