Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Disparity Studies - African American-Owned Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain certification agency, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to contract with an independent consultant to conduct a review of the "Business Disparities in the Maryland Market Area" study completed on February 8, 2017 to evaluate, on or before October 1, 2021, whether the data in the study demonstrates a compelling interest to implement certain remedial measures specifically to assist African American-owned businesses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Disparity Studies - African American-Owned Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement - Disparity Studies - African American-Owned Businesses
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page