Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Pena-Melnyk, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Bhandari, Brooks, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hill, Holmes, R. Jones, Love, Moon, Ruth, Shetty, Solomon, Terrasa, Watson, Williams, Boyce, Clark, Foley, Gilchrist, Jalisi, Lierman, Stein, Stewart, and Wells
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Patuxent River Commission by increasing the voting membership from 34 to 36 members and including 1 individual representing an organization or unit of local government engaged in watershed management and restoration, the Patuxent Riverkeeper, and the President of the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science or a designee.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0367
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Patuxent River Commission – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Patuxent River Commission – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Patuxent River Commission – Membership
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {813525/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Patuxent River Commission – Membership
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263221/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Text - Chapter - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page