Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring pharmacy benefits managers to file with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, beginning January 1, 2022, and every 3 months thereafter, a certain report of all drugs appearing on the National Average Drug Acquisition Cost list that were reimbursed during a certain period at an amount below a certain cost plus a certain fee; requiring that the report be made available to the public by the Commissioner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0614
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements
House 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
(   15-102.3 )
(   15-1612 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:58 PM
Click to return on the top page