Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsored by
Delegate Buckel
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to examine the composition and purpose of the orphans' courts in Maryland and make recommendations about how to improve the orphans' courts in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0339 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {442316/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-14)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {442316/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (120-14) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:18 PM
Click to return on the top page