Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - High-Risk Highways MC 15-24
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on highways in Montgomery County that are at high risk for certain motor vehicle crashes; prohibiting the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on certain highways in Montgomery County; requiring the fines collected by Montgomery County or by a municipal government in Montgomery County as a result of violations enforced by a speed monitoring system to be used to fund the study, design, and construction of certain safety-related projects; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-26)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - High-Risk Highways MC 15-24
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {723623/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - High-Risk Highways MC 15-24
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (106-26) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:05 PM
Click to return on the top page