Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to recommend and implement certain design elements related to pedestrian and bicycle safety when developing certain projects; requiring the Governor, for fiscal year 2024, to include an appropriation in the annual budget bill for certain purposes; providing that it is the intent of the General Assembly that the Department maximize applications for and access to federal funding that is or may become available for infrastructure for pedestrian and bicycle safety; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0880
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {153423/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (33-90)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {283222/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (37-90)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {183229/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {153423/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (33-90) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {283222/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (37-90) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page