Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 775
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Department of Labor, to produce a guidance document, by December 30, 2021, concerning the application of employee protection laws to the use of personal care aides by residential service agencies; requiring a residential service agency to certify certain information through the signature of a certain individual as a condition of obtaining or renewing a license; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {946589/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-41)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 775
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {946589/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-41) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Referred Rules 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 775
Text - Chapter - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
(   19-4A-01, 19-4A-11 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page