Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliary and Reserve Volunteers
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons, Arikan, Bagnall, D. Jones, Phillips, Roberson, Schmidt, Wilkins, Williams, Wims, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $5,000 to $7,000, a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for an individual who is a qualifying police auxiliary or reserve volunteer.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0108
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliary and Reserve Volunteers
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliary and Reserve Volunteers
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/26/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page