Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from considering a claim for a weather-related event for the purpose of canceling or refusing to renew coverage for homeowner's insurance if the claim is for an amount of loss that is less than the insured's deductible under the policy or is resolved with no payout to or on behalf of the homeowner by the insurer.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723694/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {723694/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page